Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 17:07:02 (UTC).

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE vs YOSVEIDY RODRIGUEZ

Case Summary

On 03/29/2016 HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE filed a Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture lawsuit against YOSVEIDY RODRIGUEZ. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Rice, G. Elizabeth and Rice, Elizabeth G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2942

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Forfeiture - Other Forfeiture

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Rice, G. Elizabeth

Rice, Elizabeth G

 

Party Details

Defendants

TWO MENS NECKLACES

MADELINE, ROSA

PEREZ VALDIVIA, MARIELA

SOLER POMARES, HUGO FRANCISCO

ONE 2009 TOYOTA CAMRY

ONE 2006 HAULMARK MOTOR COACH TRAILER

MUNERA ORTIZ, JHON ERICK

RODRIGUEZ LLEO, YOSVEIDY

OROSCO, IVAN

Tampa, FL 33619

GUTIERREZ, THAIS CHAPLE

ALVAREZ, YUNIER CALERO

Tampa, FL 33614

TELLEZ, JORGE

ONE 2014 MERCEDES-BENZ CL65 AMG

ONE 2010 ACE BOAT TRAILER

ALLY FINANCIAL

AMT ONE THOUSAND $371.00

ONE 2015 NISSAN ALTIMA

AMT FORTY-FIVE THOUSAND $669.00

ONE 2015 - 54" CUB CADET MOWER

SANTANDER CONSUMER USA

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorneys

DEGIROLAMO , JOHNNY G

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JOHN DEGIROLAMO, ESQ.

1005 N Marion St

Tampa, FL 33602

LOPEZ , RAY CHRISTOPHER

115 S Albany Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

FERNANDEZ, RALPH E, Esquire

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RALPH E FERNANDEZ

109 S Moody Ave

Tampa, FL 33609

Other Attorneys

DIAZ , DARIO DANIO

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF DARIO DIAZ, P.A.

1101 N Armenia Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

STAVROU , ALEX REED

Attorney at ALEX R. STAVROU, P.A.

300 S Hyde Park Ave Ste 180

Tampa, FL 33606

BROWN , LINDSEY TATUM

Po Box 3371

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

08/01/2017: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/23/2016: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

06/20/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/18/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/18/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/18/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/18/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

04/21/2016: COMPLAINT

FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT

09/06/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT AFTER DEFAULT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/17/2018: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

CORRESPONDENCE

09/06/2017: CORRESPONDENCE

STIPULATED ORDER

10/02/2016: STIPULATED ORDER

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/09/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

08/09/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

07/29/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/06/2016: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

06/08/2016: 20 DAYS SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/18/2016: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

83 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/25/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DIAZ, DARIO D, Esquire; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: STAVROU, ALEX REED; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: LOPEZ, RAY CHRISTOPHER; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: BROWN, L TATUM, Esquire; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: FERNANDEZ, RALPH E; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DEGIROLAMO, JOHNNY G, Esquire; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: RODRIGUEZ, YOSVEIDY; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION; Comment: CIVIL DISMISSAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Defendant: PEREZ, YOSARI; Date 2: 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
302 More Docket Entries
  • 05/19/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017199650

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017199676

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017199663

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017197867

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017197885

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017197860

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016180196; Judge: Rice, Elizabeth G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2016
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016166660

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2016
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2016159876

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: VDIS; Judgment Description: VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017070545

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SANTANDER CONSUMER USA INC. AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION DBA CHRYSLER CAPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where Ally Financial Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DIAZ , DARIO DANIO

Latest cases represented by Lawyer STAVROU , ALEX REED