Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/18/2021 at 00:28:54 (UTC).

HILL;SARA VS HILL III;JOHN

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 HILL SARA filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HILL III JOHN. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa, Allen, Lisa. A and Allen, Lisa A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5220

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

Allen, Lisa A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILL, SARA JEAN

Tampa, FL 33619

Respondent

HILL III, JOHN

Valrico, FL 33596

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PRENOVEAU , KATHERINE FRANKLIN

Attorney at THE SPRING OF TAMPA BAY

Po Box 5147

Tampa, FL 33675

Respondent Attorney

SAUNDERS , JONATHAN RANDALL

Attorney at JONATHAN SAUNDERS, ESQ.

2519 N Mcmullen Booth Rd Ste 510-205

Clearwater, FL 33761

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2021
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:30 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT REVIEWED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF VIOLATION OF INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, SARA JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketSUPPLEMENTAL AFFIDAVIT IN SUPPORT OF PETITION; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, SARA JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO SAO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AMENDED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, UNIFORM CHILD CUSTODY JURISDICTION ACT, PETITION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: HILL III, JOHN; Date Served: 06/24/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 306 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Comment: Your temporary injunction for protection has been extended. A new hearing date has been set. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are available at any of ; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, SARA JEAN; Respondent: HILL III, JOHN; Date Signed: 06/21/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
25 More Docket Entries
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR INJUNCTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketRESPONDENT BROCHURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketQUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, SARA JEAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITH CHILD(REN); Comment: Your request for a temporary injunction against Domestic Violence has been granted. The judge has set a hearing. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. Certified copies of your Temporary Injunction are ; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, SARA JEAN; Respondent: HILL III, JOHN; Date Signed: 04/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer PRENOVEAU , KATHERINE FRANKLIN