This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/20/2021 at 04:10:18 (UTC).

HILL, CORA vs HILL, ANGEL

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 HILL, CORA filed a Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HILL, ANGEL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, A. Richard, Weis, Richard. A and Weis, Richard A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6424

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Domestic Partnership Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard. A

Weis, Richard A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

HILL, CORA

Plant City, FL 33565

Respondent

HILL, ANGEL

Plant City, FL 33565

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • HearingAmended Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL RESPONDENT SERVED; Comment: INSUFFICIENT EVIDENCE Document electronically transmitted to HCSO on 2021-06-01 10:17. ; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA; Respondent: HILL, ANGEL; Date Signed: 06/01/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: TEMPORARY INJUNCTION, AMENDED DOMESTIC VIOLENCE INJUNCTION, PETITION, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: HILL, ANGEL; Date Served: 05/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • HearingTemporary Injunction Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: JIIO-JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketAMENDED TEMPORARY INJUNCTION; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA; Respondent: HILL, ANGEL; Date Signed: 05/25/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
22 More Docket Entries
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PCCS-PETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketTEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA; Respondent: HILL, ANGEL; Date Signed: 05/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: TIWOC-TEMPORARY INJUNCTION WITHOUT CHILD(REN); Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Respondent: HILL, ANGEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: JIIO-JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: HILL, CORA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2021
  • DocketQUESTIONNAIRE

    Read MoreRead Less