This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/16/2021 at 21:47:53 (UTC).

Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC,ALMANZAR, DEMETRIO ROSARIO vs LM General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/14/2021 Hess Spinal Medical Centers of Town Country, LLC,ALMANZAR, DEMETRIO ROSARIO filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LM General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James and Moody, James. S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7155

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

111 2Nd Ave Ne Suite 630

Saint Petersburg, FL 33701

ALMANZAR, DEMETRIO ROSARIO

Defendant

LM General Insurance Company

200 E. Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PETTY , C SPENCER

Attorney at IRVIN & PETTY, P.A.

111 2Nd Ave Ne Ste 630

St Petersburg, FL 33701

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/20/2021: MOTION FOR DEFAULT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/15/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/15/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/14/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketREQUEST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketORDER OF DEFAULT; Additional Info: Defendant: LM General Insurance Company; Date Signed: 08/23/2021; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.500(b) AGAINST LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT; Comment: BY THE COURT PURSUANT TO FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.500(b) AGAINST LM GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: LM General Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hess Spinal & Medical Centers of Town & Country, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Hess Spinal & Medical Centers Of Town & Country, Llc A/A/O Jenayah Morse is a litigant

Latest cases where LM General Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PETTY , C SPENCER