This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/01/2021 at 02:31:37 (UTC).

Hertenstein, Stacey vs Baycare Health System, Inc.

Case Summary

On 06/04/2021 Hertenstein, Stacey filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Baycare Health System, Inc. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4602

  • Filing Date:

    06/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hertenstein, Stacey

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendant

Baycare Health System, Inc.

2985 Drew Street

Clearwater, FL 33759

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THALJI , SAMI

Attorney at FLORIDA CONSUMER LAWYERS

3550 Buschwood Park Dr Ste 150

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendant Attorney

AUNGST , BRIAN JAMES, Jr

Attorney at MACFARLANE FERGUSON & MCMULLEN

625 Court St

Clearwater, FL 33756

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/14/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

06/04/2021: COMPLAINT

General Differentiated Case Management Order

06/07/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/07/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

06/04/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

06/04/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

06/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/07/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Cancelled Comments: Voluntary Dismissal of Cause; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2021442622; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Baycare Health System, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Baycare Health System, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 6/24/2021 BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM, INC CORPORATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Baycare Health System, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hertenstein, Stacey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAYCARE HEALTH SYSTEM INC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THALJI , SAMI