This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/12/2022 at 00:31:53 (UTC).

Hernando Hma Llc vs Tran, Kieu Trinh

Case Summary

On 07/20/2022 Hernando Hma Llc filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Tran, Kieu Trinh. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Hooi, J. Michael, Hooi, Michael. J and Hooi, Michael J. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4065

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Hooi, J. Michael

Hooi, Michael. J

Hooi, Michael J

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

BRAVERA HEALTH SPRING HILL

Hernando Hma Llc

1980 Michigan Avenue

Cocoa, FL 32922

Defendant

Tran, Kieu Trinh

Tampa, FL 33607-1134

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE , TROY R

Attorney at LOTANE & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

1980 Michigan Ave

Cocoa, FL 32922-5729

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/20/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/20/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/20/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

07/21/2022: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

09/03/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

09/06/2022: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2022
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Cancelled Comments: Non-Service on Summons; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/82393131402 MEETING ID: 823 9313 1402NO PASSWORD REQUIRED Judicial Officer: Hooi, Michael J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEFT: KIEU TRINH TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: DEF KIEU TRINH TRAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: Tran, Kieu Trinh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hernando Hma Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hernando Hma Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hernando Hma Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hernando Hma Llc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BRAVERA HEALTH SPRING HILL is a litigant

Latest cases where HERNANDO HMA, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lotane, Troy R