This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 10/17/2019 at 03:36:49 (UTC).

Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia vs HERNANDEZ, EDWIN OSCAR

Case Summary

On 12/14/2018 Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against HERNANDEZ, EDWIN OSCAR. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Tharpe, Chet A. and Tharpe, A.. Chet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9344

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Tharpe, Chet A.

Tharpe, A.. Chet

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

Brandon, FL 33511

Respondent

HERNANDEZ, EDWIN OSCAR

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

DA SILVA , MONICA PRISCILLA

Attorney at DA SILVA LAW FIRM, P.A.

3030 N Rocky Point Dr W Ste 150

Tampa, FL 33607

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2019
  • CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • NOTICE; Comment: OF TERMINATION OF LIMITED APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia; Respondent: HERNANDEZ, EDWIN OSCAR; Signed: 05/13/2019; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, Chet A.; Vol./Book: 26632, Page: 1765, Number of Pages: 1765

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: SHORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • ANSWER AND WAIVER; Comment: ACCEPTANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: HERNANDEZ, EDWIN OSCAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/26/2018
  • LETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: [RE NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL FILED 12/14/18] EMAILED AND/ OR MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: admin@familymaritallaw.com ; monica@familymaritallaw.com ; Additional Info: Respondent: HERNANDEZ, EDWIN OSCAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2018
  • STANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • COPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Comment: WIFE'S FL DRIVER'S LICENSE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • DH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: (LIMITED) MONICA P. DA SILVA, ESQ. ON BEHALF OF THE PETITIONER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PETITIONER'S FL DRIVER'S LICENSE (NOT ATTACHED); Additional Info: Petitioner: Hernandez, Carmen Cecilia

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • Case Management Conference; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 4 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, Chet A.

    Read MoreRead Less