This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/08/2022 at 18:37:39 (UTC).

HENSLEY, ROBERT C. vsGERELCOM INC

Case Summary

On 03/31/2022 HENSLEY, ROBERT C vsGERELCOM INC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, M.. Melissa, Polo, Melissa. M. and Polo, Melissa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2681

  • Filing Date:

    03/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, Melissa M.

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa. M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

GERELCOM INC

C/O Registered Agent: Singer S Michael 3825 Pga Boulevard, Suite 701

Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SABA , CHRISTOPHER JAMES

Attorney at WENZEL FENTON CABASSA, P.A.

1110 N Florida Ave Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

LOPEZ , KATHRYN L

Attorney at MS. KATHRYN L. LOPEZ

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 400

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

03/31/2022: NOTICE OF DISCOVERY

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/31/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

03/31/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

03/31/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/31/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

03/31/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/31/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

04/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

04/01/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

04/27/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/06/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/21/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/01/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/07/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003 Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GERELCOM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: GERELCOM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GERELCOM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 04/21/2022 DEFT GERELCOM INC.C/O RA; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: GERELCOM INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • DocketINTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HENSLEY, ROBERT C.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SABA , CHRISTOPHER JAMES