This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/15/2023 at 23:35:42 (UTC).

Head, Adam vs KB Home

Case Summary

On 11/30/2022 Head, Adam filed a Property - Construction Defect lawsuit against KB Home. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Polo, Melissa. M., Polo, M.. Melissa and Polo, Melissa M.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9940

  • Filing Date:

    11/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Construction Defect

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Polo, Melissa. M.

Polo, M.. Melissa

Polo, Melissa M.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Head, Adam

Palm Harbor, FL 34684

Defendants

KB Home

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

KB Home Florida LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company, As Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

KB Home Tampa LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company, As Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301-2525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBRIEN , NEIL PATRICK

Attorney at FLORIN ROEBIG P.A.

777 Alderman Rd

Palm Harbor, FL 34683

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/30/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/30/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

11/30/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/30/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

12/01/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

12/01/2022: Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

MOTION TO DISMISS

12/27/2022: MOTION TO DISMISS

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/13/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/13/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

01/13/2023: E-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/06/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:30 AM; Hearing Location: ZOOM HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/8901592416 MEETING NUMBER: 890-159-2416IF JOINING BY PHONE, DIAL 1-786-635-1003; Judicial Officer: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2023
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS / EXHIBITS ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2022609909; Judge: Polo, Melissa M.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home; Defendant: KB Home Florida LLC; Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3; Additional Info: Defendant: KB Home; Defendant: KB Home Florida LLC; Defendant: KB Home Tampa LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Head, Adam;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less