This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/29/2022 at 13:37:00 (UTC).

HAYS, ROBERTA vs PETSMART LLC

Case Summary

On 03/23/2022 HAYS, ROBERTA filed an Other lawsuit against PETSMART LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, Jennifer X, Gabbard, X. Jennifer and Gabbard, Jennifer. X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2428

  • Filing Date:

    03/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, Jennifer X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

HAYS, ROBERTA

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendant

PETSMART LLC

801 Us Highway 1

North Palm Beach, FL 33408

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CAULFIELD , BRYAN DAVID

Attorney at PERENICH CAULFIELD AVRIL & NOYES PA

1875 N Belcher Rd Ste 201

Clearwater, FL 33765

Defendant Attorney

GAGAIN, EDWARD FRANCIS, III

Attorney at GOLDEN SCAZ GAGAIN, PLLC

1135 Marbella Plaza Dr

Tampa, FL 33619-7905

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

06/17/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

06/13/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/24/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/24/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

05/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/19/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

04/21/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/21/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

04/11/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

04/11/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

04/11/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/11/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

04/11/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

04/05/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

03/24/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/23/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/15/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230 Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HAYS, ROBERTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HAYS, ROBERTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HAYS, ROBERTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HAYS, ROBERTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HAYS, ROBERTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 04/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 03/30/2022 DEFT PETSMART LLC F/K/A PETSMART, INC; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HAYS, ROBERTA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x1; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Defendant: PETSMART LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PACIFIC COAST DISTRIBUTING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EDWARD FRANCIS GAGAIN III