Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/16/2021 at 05:43:34 (UTC).

HAYNIE, GEORGE COOK - Estate

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 HAYNIE, GEORGE COOK - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1360

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioners and Trustees

HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

Tampa, FL 33606

HAYNIE, ASHLEY SUSAN

Delray Beach, FL 33455

AUSTIN, MITZI COCKRELL

Gainesville, FL 32606

Decedent

HAYNIE, GEORGE COOK

Tampa, FL 33606

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Trustee Attorney

FRIEDRICH , ASHLEY GIANNA

Attorney at HINES NORMAN HINES, P.L.

315 S Hyde Park Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS; Additional Info: Decedent: HAYNIE, GEORGE COOK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: ASHLEY SUSAN HAYNIE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SRVC NOTICE TO CREDTR; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: MITZI COCKRELL AUSTIN, TRUSTEE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketWVR OF NOTICE OF ADMIN; Comment: PATRICIA COCKRELL HAYNIE, INDIV & TRUSTEE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketORDER ADMITTING WILL-APPT PR; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Date 2: 04/27/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: ORIGNIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketLETTER FROM; Comment: ASHLEY GIANNA FRIEDRICH, ESQ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPROBATE NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-WILL; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NO FLA EST TAX DUE; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Comment: (PET, DC); Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Comment: E-FILED; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Comment: PAID; Additional Info: Beneficiary: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Personal Representative: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Petitioner: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL; Trustee: HAYNIE, PATRICIA COCKRELL

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer FRIEDRICH , ASHLEY GIANNA