Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/03/2021 at 17:45:28 (UTC).

HART, KEVIN EUGENE - Estate

Case Summary

On 04/15/2021 HART, KEVIN EUGENE - Estate was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1330

  • Filing Date:

    04/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioners

GREENE, ALICE REGINA

Mulberry, FL 33860

HART, JULIA RENEE

Thonotosassa, FL 33592

Decedent

HART, KEVIN EUGENE

Thonotosassa, FL 33592

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court and Petitioner Attorney

ALVAREZ , DEREK BRIAN

Attorney at GENDERS- ALVAREZ- DIECIDUE P.A.

2307 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33609-3321

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketNOTICE TO CREDITORS; Comment: 1ST PUB: 04/30/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketINVENTORY OF PERSONAL REP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF INVENTORY; Comment: JULIA RENEE HART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketPROOF OF PUB OF NOTICE CREDITORS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING PERS REP; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketLETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Date 2: 04/26/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 04/15/21; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: ALVAREZ , DEREK BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPET FOR ADMIN-FLA RES W-O WILL; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketPETITION TO WAIVE BOND; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: ALICE REGINA GREENE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERT-OTHER THAN PRIMARY; Comment: VANNIE JAMES FRANKLIN, SR.; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketFUNERAL BILL; Comment: WILSON FUNERAL HOME; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Comment: JULIA RENEE HART; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketW-PRIOR,NOTICE CONSENT TO P R; Comment: JULIA RENEE HART; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketDEATH CERTIFICATE FILED; Additional Info: Personal Representative: GREENE, ALICE REGINA; Petitioner: GREENE, ALICE REGINA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , DEREK B