This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 12/03/2019 at 10:43:09 (UTC).

HARRISON, AYANNA vs REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

Case Summary

On 01/07/2019 HARRISON, AYANNA filed a Contract - Product Liability lawsuit against REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Nielsen, A. Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0173

  • Filing Date:

    01/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Product Liability

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Nielsen, A. Richard

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AYANNA HARRISON as parent and natural guardian of J.R., J.H. AND J.B.

HARRISON, AYANNA

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

C/O Gunn Law Group 401 East Jackson Street, #3600

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

GUNN IV, LEE D, IV, Esquire

Attorney at GUNN LAW GROUP PA

401 East Jackson Street Suite 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5225

GUNN, IV, LEE D

Attorney at GUNN LAW GROUP PA

401 East Jackson Street Suite 3600

Tampa, FL 33602-5225

Defendant Attorney

FORTE , JENNIFER K

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF MARC M. CRUMPTON, JR.

13577 Feather Sound Dr Ste 390

Clearwater, FL 33762

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

03/20/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/27/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

WAIVER

02/19/2019: WAIVER

REQUEST FOR COPIES

02/19/2019: REQUEST FOR COPIES

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

02/18/2019: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/28/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

01/28/2019: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

01/28/2019: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

01/28/2019: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/28/2019: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/09/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

AMENDED COMPLAINT

01/08/2019: AMENDED COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/08/2019: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/07/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

01/07/2019: COMPLAINT

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/26/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
39 More Docket Entries
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: DEFENDANT S- FIRST CONSORTIUM PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: DEFENDANT S- FIRST CONSORTIUM PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Comment: DEFENDANT S- FIRST CONSORTIUM PLAINTIFF; Additional Info: Defendant: REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1 - lgunn@gunnlawgroup.com ; efile@gunnlawgroup.com ; labramson@gunnlawgroup.com; Additional Info: Defendant: REFURBISHED OFFICE FURNITURE INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Comment: lgunn@gunnlawgroup.com ; efile@gunnlawgroup.com ; labramson@gunnlawgroup.com ; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: HARRISON, AYANNA

    Read MoreRead Less