This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/28/2022 at 01:41:10 (UTC).

Harris, Shanta Rita vs Harris, Olrick F

Case Summary

On 04/28/2022 Harris, Shanta Rita filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against Harris, Olrick F. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Alvarez, Lindsay. M, Alvarez, Lindsay M and Alvarez, M. Lindsay. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5695

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Alvarez, M. Lindsay

Alvarez, Lindsay. M

Alvarez, Lindsay M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Harris, Shanta Rita

Tampa, FL 33612

Respondent

Harris, Olrick F

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

STRACHAN , LASHAWN

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF LASHAWN STRACHAN

5118 N 56Th St Ste 102

Tampa, FL 33610

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2022
  • HearingCase Management Conference; Hearing Time: 11:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 401 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Alvarez, Lindsay M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketSTANDING TEMPORARY ORDER FOR FAMILY LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: INDIGENT REMAINDER FEE DUE AND OWING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: INDIGENT REMAINDER FEE DUE AND OWING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketSRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketPETITION FILED; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASE; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketFINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketANSWER AND WAIVER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: Harris, Shanta Rita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketCIVIL AFFIDAVIT APPL INDIGENT STATUS - INDIGENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDUPLICATE AFFIDAVIT FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDUPLICATE AFFIDAVIT FOR INDIGENT STATUS

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer STRACHAN , LASHAWN