This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 11/26/2021 at 03:03:37 (UTC).

HARRIS, DONIVAN vs RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL

Case Summary

On 04/29/2021 HARRIS, DONIVAN filed a Family - Other Family lawsuit against RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Old Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Weis, A. Richard, Weis, Richard A and Weis, Richard. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5880

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Weis, A. Richard

Weis, Richard A

Weis, Richard. A

 

Party Details

Petitioners

HARRIS, DONIVAN

Plant City, FL 33567

HARRIS, DONIVAN LEE

Plant City, FL 33567

Respondent

RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPAPER CASE FILE DESTROYED - DIGITIZED; Comment: Paper document converted to electronic image(s) destroyed per requirements set forth in Rules of Judicial Administration 2.525(c)(2)(B); (c)(2)(F); and (c)(4). PC DV

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: RISK PROTECTION ORDER, FINAL, STALKING; Additional Info: Respondent: RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL; Date Served: 05/20/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: IPRS-INJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Additional Info: Petitioner: HARRIS, DONIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • HearingOrder Setting Hearing; Hearing Time: 08:30 AM; Hearing Location: PLANT CITY COURTHOUSE, COURTROOM 3 301 N MICHIGAN AVE PLANT CITY, FL 33563; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCOURT DOCKET PAGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT INJUNCTION STALKING VIOLENCE; Comment: 2 YEARS-EXPIRES 5/13/2023; Additional Info: Petitioner: HARRIS, DONIVAN; Respondent: RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL; Date Signed: 05/13/2021; Judicial Officer: Weis, Richard A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketSHERIFF INFORMATION SHEET; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: FINAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION PETITION RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ORDER, STALKING, PETITION, ORDER SETTING HEARING, NOTICE OF RELATED CASES; Additional Info: Respondent: RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL; Date Served: 05/04/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketPETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketINJUNCTION COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: PCCS-PETITIONER COPY COVERSHEET; Additional Info: Petitioner: HARRIS, DONIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: Based on the facts stated in your petition, the court has set a hearing to take testimony and make a ruling on the petition. The hearing date is available at HOVER.hillsclerk.com on the Hearings tab of the case. A supplemental petition with additiona; Additional Info: Petitioner: HARRIS, DONIVAN; Respondent: RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL; Date 2: 04/29/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: OSH-Order Setting Hearing; Additional Info: Petitioner: HARRIS, DONIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketJUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Respondent: RICHARDSON, NATHANIEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORDER SENT TO PETITIONER VIA TEXT/EMAIL; Comment: JIIO-JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Additional Info: Petitioner: HARRIS, DONIVAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketEMAIL SENT TO HCSO CIVIL PROCESSING UNIT

    Read MoreRead Less