Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/28/2019 at 23:51:22 (UTC).

Harbor Bay Community Development District vsState of Florida

Case Summary

On 05/11/2016 Harbor Bay Community Development District vsState of Florida was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cook, J.. Martha and Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4497

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cook, J.. Martha

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant

Harbor Bay Community Development District

119 S. Monroe Street, Suite 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant

State of Florida

Tampa, FL 33602

Counter Plaintiffs and Intervenors

Alidade MiraBay LLC

Alidade MiraBay Land LLC

Intervenors

Terrabrook Apollo Beach LLC

4790 Eastgate Mall, Suite 150

San Diego, CA 92121

Alidade MiraBay LLC

Alidade MiraBay Land, LLC

C/O R. Marshall Rainey, Esq. Pob 380

Tampa, FL 33601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Counter Defendant Attorney

SMITH, DOUGLAS M.

Attorney at HOPPING GREEN & SAMS, P.A.

119 S Monroe St Ste 300

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Defendant Attorney

CARMONA , ADA

419 N Pierce St

Tampa, FL 33602

Intervenor and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

RAINEY , R MARSHALL, Esquire

Attorney at BURR & FORMAN LLP

One Tampa City Center, Suite 3200 201 North Franklin Street

Tampa, FL 33602

CARREJA, TIRSO M, JR, Esquire

Attorney at SHUTTS & BOWEN LLP

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33607-5716

MORRIS , KRISTIN KRAMER

Attorney at SHUTTS AND BOWEN, LLP

4301 W Boy Scout Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33607

STEADY , SCOTT IRWIN

Po Box 380

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

WITHDRAWAL

05/10/2017: WITHDRAWAL

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

05/08/2017: MEMORANDUM OF LAW

ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

04/16/2017: ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

MOTION TO WITHDRAW

04/13/2017: MOTION TO WITHDRAW

WITNESS LIST

02/14/2017: WITNESS LIST

ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

12/06/2016: ORDER SETTING PRE TRIAL AND NON JURY TRIAL

NOTICE

10/24/2016: NOTICE

MOTION TO INTERVENE

09/14/2016: MOTION TO INTERVENE

FINAL JUDGMENT

05/15/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION

05/10/2017: NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING

05/10/2017: NOTICE OF FILING

ORDER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

05/03/2017: ORDER OF PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/21/2017: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

09/20/2016: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

MOTION TO INTERVENE

09/14/2016: MOTION TO INTERVENE

ORDER GRANTING

09/12/2016: ORDER GRANTING

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/31/2016: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

COMPLAINT

05/11/2016: COMPLAINT

37 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • JOINT; Comment: EXHIBIT LIST

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Comment: TRANSCRIPT OF PAUL V. SHERMA, P.E. TAKEN ON 4/26/17 - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: INTERVENORS, ALIDADE MIRABAY, LLC ALIDADE MIRABAY LAND, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WITHDRAWAL; Comment: INTERVENOR'S - OF OBJECTIONS AND STIPULATION OF ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEPOSITION DESIGNATION; Comment: NOTICE OF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Comment: TRANSCRIPT OF ROGER ARCHABAL 05/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF LAW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Comment: TRANSCRIPT OF SCOTT A. BRIZENDINE TAKEN ON 4/19/17 - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING DEPOSITION; Comment: TRANSCRIPT OF WILLIAM RIZZETTA TAKEN 4/19/17 - ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO INTERVENE; Additional Info: Intervenor: Alidade MiraBay Land, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING; Comment: TERRABROOKS APOLLO BEACH, LLC'S MOTION TO INTERVENE; Additional Info: Defendant: State of Florida; Intervenor: Terrabrook Apollo Beach LLC; Plaintiff: Harbor Bay Community Development District; Private Attorney: CARREJA, TIRSO M, JR, Esquire; Private Attorney: SMITH, DOUGLAS M.; Date Signed: 09/07/2016; Judicial Officer: Wolfe, Mark

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: & NOTICE OF EMAIL DESIGNATION OF PRIMARY & SECONDARY ADDRESSES FOR INTERVENER; Additional Info: Intervenor: Terrabrook Apollo Beach LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO INTERVENE; Additional Info: Intervenor: Terrabrook Apollo Beach LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE; Comment: BY STATE ATTORNEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • FILE HOME LOCATION IS TAMPA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: dougs@hgslaw.com ; shelleyl@hgslaw.com

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2017196404; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALIDADE MIRABAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where HARBOR BAY COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT DISTRICT is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, DOUGLAS M.