This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 08/08/2022 at 15:51:46 (UTC).

Hammond, Paradine vs Ross Dress For Less, Inc.

Case Summary

On 05/25/2022 Hammond, Paradine filed an Other lawsuit against Ross Dress For Less, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Thomas, Cheryl. K, Thomas, K. Cheryl and Thomas, Cheryl K. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4355

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Thomas, K. Cheryl

Thomas, Cheryl. K

Thomas, Cheryl K

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hammond, Paradine

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Ross Dress For Less, Inc.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

RSG Florida Crossings, LLC

2507 South Mcdill Avenue, Suite C

Tampa, FL 33602

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON , JAMES RICHARD

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN, P.A.

201 N Franklin St Fl 7

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorney

KRAFT , MICHAEL

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

07/28/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

07/18/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

07/08/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/08/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/08/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/07/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/08/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/08/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

06/08/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

05/25/2022: COMPLAINT

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/25/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/25/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/25/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/25/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/25/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/25/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

LETTER TO

05/25/2022: LETTER TO

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:30 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/93553574539 MEETING ID: 935 5357 4539 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDCOURTCALL 888-882-6878 Judicial Officer: Thomas, Cheryl K

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine; Private Attorney: WILSON , JAMES RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine; Private Attorney: WILSON , JAMES RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x2; Additional Info: Defendant: Ross Dress For Less, Inc.; Defendant: RSG Florida Crossings, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hammond, Paradine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS FEE JRWPleadings@ForThePeople.com; JWilson@ForThePeople.com; MWood@forthepeople.com; Additional Info: Private Attorney: WILSON , JAMES RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ROSS DRESS FOR LESS INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAFT, MICHAEL