This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/05/2021 at 20:02:43 (UTC).

Hall, Marie Y vs Miller, Nathan Curtis

Case Summary

On 05/06/2021 Hall, Marie Y filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Miller, Nathan Curtis. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Battles, L. Emmett, Battles, Emmett. L and Battles, Emmett L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3800

  • Filing Date:

    05/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Battles, L. Emmett

Battles, Emmett. L

Battles, Emmett L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hall, Marie Y

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendants

Miller, Nathan Curtis

Wesley Chapel, FL 33545

Quest Diagnostics Incorporated

C/O Ct Corporation As Ra 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRING , SAMUEL STUART, Jr

3712 W Azeele St

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

08/03/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/06/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/06/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/06/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/06/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/07/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/07/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/07/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/06/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

05/06/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/06/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/06/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Judicial Officer: Battles, Emmett L

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketAMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hall, Marie Y

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Quest Diagnostics Incorporated is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MEHRING, SAMUEL S, Esquire