This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 05/08/2022 at 19:27:44 (UTC).

Halbert, Rachel Lynn vs Cleckner, Nicholas Paul

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 Halbert, Rachel Lynn filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Cleckner, Nicholas Paul. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer, Gabbard, Jennifer X and Gabbard, Jennifer. X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8741

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer X

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Halbert, Rachel Lynn

Trinity, FL 34655

Defendants

Cleckner, Nicholas Paul

Riverview, FL 33579

Pepsico, Inc.

1200 South Pine Island Road

Plantation, FL 33324

BOTTLING GROUP, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VIANNA , MISTY MORGAN

Attorney at KEMP RUGE & GREEN

11567 Trinity Blvd

Trinity, FL 34655

Defendant Attorney

FICARROTTA , JONATHAN

Attorney at LA CAVA, JACOBSON & GOODIS, P.A.

501 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/02/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/02/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/02/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/02/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/02/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

COMPLAINT

11/02/2021: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

05/04/2022: NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

CERTIFICATE OF

05/04/2022: CERTIFICATE OF

NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE

04/04/2022: NOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

03/23/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

03/23/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

03/18/2022: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

03/09/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/21/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

02/21/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

44 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230 Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION PURSUANT TO FLORIDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE THAT CAUSE IS AT ISSUE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: BOTTLING GROUP, LLC; Defendant: Cleckner, Nicholas Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: BOTTLING GROUP, LLC; Defendant: Cleckner, Nicholas Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: BOTTLING GROUP, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
45 More Docket Entries
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Halbert, Rachel Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Cleckner, Nicholas Paul; Defendant: Pepsico, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOTTLING GROUP, LLC, A NEW YORK CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where PEPSICO INC. A CALIFORNIA COROPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VIANNA , MISTY MORGAN