This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 05/18/2023 at 06:35:35 (UTC).

Hadley, Jennifer vs BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Hadley, Jennifer filed an Other lawsuit against BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4747

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hadley, Jennifer

Defendants

BRE Hotels and Resorts, LLC

BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC

FAIRFIELD INN BY MARRIOTT C/O BRE SELECT HOTELS

BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC

BREIT REX TRS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE

Defendant Attorney

VALASHINAS , KIMBERLY MURPHY

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

08/28/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/06/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

AGREED ORDER

08/24/2022: AGREED ORDER

JOINT STIPULATION

04/11/2023: JOINT STIPULATION

ORDER

04/10/2023: ORDER

MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

02/10/2023: MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/09/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/03/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

42 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/08/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023201221; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/08/2023
  • DocketORDER OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Cancelled Comments: Per Judge's Order; Hearing Time: 03:15 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: STIPFORDSM; Judgment Description: STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023160192; Judge: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION OF DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/11/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJOINT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES; Additional Info: Defendant: BRE Hotels and Resorts, LLC; Defendant: BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX TRS, LLC; Defendant: FAIRFIELD INN BY MARRIOTT C/O BRE SELECT HOTELS; Plaintiff: Hadley, Jennifer; Private Attorney: RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE; Private Attorney: VALASHINAS , KIMBERLY MURPHY; Date 2: 04/10/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITIONS, Corey Jackson and Krystal Arnold - 2/13/23 AT 10AM AND 1PM; Additional Info: Defendant: BRE Hotels and Resorts, LLC; Defendant: BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
42 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less