This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/12/2023 at 01:39:42 (UTC).

Hadley, Jennifer vs BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC

Case Summary

On 06/06/2022 Hadley, Jennifer filed an Other lawsuit against BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Barbas, Rex. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4747

  • Filing Date:

    06/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Barbas, Rex

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Hadley, Jennifer

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendants

BRE Hotels and Resorts, LLC

6720 Lakeview Center Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC

6720 Lakeview Center Drive

Tampa, FL 33619

FAIRFIELD INN BY MARRIOTT C/O BRE SELECT HOTELS

BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC

BREIT REX TRS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE

Attorney at RUSSOMANNO & BORRELLO, P.A

150 W Flagler St Ste 2800

Miami, FL 33130

Defendant Attorney

VALASHINAS , KIMBERLY MURPHY

Attorney at CHUBB & SON STAFF COUNSEL

Mcguinness & Cicero 3000 Bayport Dr Ste 560

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

02/10/2023: MEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/09/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

02/03/2023: NOTICE OF CANCELLATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

02/02/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/30/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF FILING

01/25/2023: NOTICE OF FILING

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/24/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

ORDER

01/23/2023: ORDER

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

01/19/2023: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE

01/19/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

12/15/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

11/22/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

10/27/2022: AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

09/15/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

09/15/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

40 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/24/2023
  • HearingJAWS HEARING; Hearing Time: 03:15 PM; Hearing Location: 800 E. Twiggs St. Tampa, FL 33602 Room 501View Case Hearing Notice for Additional Details, as applicable.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEDIATION RESULTS REPORT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF DEPOSITIONS, Corey Jackson and Krystal Arnold - 2/13/23 AT 10AM AND 1PM; Additional Info: Defendant: BRE Hotels and Resorts, LLC; Defendant: BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 09:00 AM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 501 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602;; Judicial Officer: Barbas, Rex

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION; Comment: OF VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION, Heather Cannon - 2/6/23 AT 11AM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX TRS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX TRS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/25/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: PROPOSED AGREED UNIFORM ORDER- ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX TRS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: REQUIRING ELECTRONIC/TELEPHONIC APPEARANCES FEB 3 2023 AT 9:00; Additional Info: Defendant: BRE Hotels and Resorts, LLC; Defendant: BRE Select Hotels Properties, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX PROPERTY OWNER, LLC; Defendant: BREIT REX TRS, LLC; Defendant: FAIRFIELD INN BY MARRIOTT C/O BRE SELECT HOTELS; Plaintiff: Hadley, Jennifer; Private Attorney: RUSSOMANNO, CHRISTOPHER SALVATORE; Private Attorney: VALASHINAS , KIMBERLY MURPHY; Date 2: 01/23/2023; Judicial Officer:: Barbas, Rex;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x3

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Personal Representative: Hadley, Jennifer;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less