This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/22/2019 at 07:38:08 (UTC).

GZ Apartments LLC,JNNR Investments Inc vs Lumpkins, Lorenzo,Thorsen, Justine

Case Summary

On 01/10/2019 GZ Apartments LLC,JNNR Investments Inc filed a Property - Other Property lawsuit against Lumpkins, Lorenzo,Thorsen, Justine. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2364

  • Filing Date:

    01/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GZ Apartments LLC

12000 N Dale Mabry Hwy Suite 150

Tampa, FL 33618

JNNR Investments Inc

12000 N Dale Mabry Hwy Suite 150

Tampa, FL 33618

Defendants

Thorsen, Justine

Tampa, FL 33617

Lumpkins, Lorenzo

Tampa, FL 33617

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINGER , PATRICK MICHAEL

Attorney at LANDLORD LAW, P.A.

12000 N Dale Mabry Hwy Ste 150

Tampa, FL 33618

 

Court Documents

JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

02/18/2019: JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

NOTICE OF FILING

02/18/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/15/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

02/15/2019: MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION

EMERGENCY MOTION

02/14/2019: EMERGENCY MOTION

JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

02/12/2019: JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY

ORDER LIFTING STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/12/2019: ORDER LIFTING STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION

CORRESPONDENCE

02/11/2019: CORRESPONDENCE

MOTION

02/11/2019: MOTION

MOTION TO STAY

02/06/2019: MOTION TO STAY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

02/02/2019: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/01/2019: E-FILED PROPOSED WRIT OF POSSESSION

DEFAULT JUDGMENT

02/01/2019: DEFAULT JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

01/31/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

VERIFICATION

01/27/2019: VERIFICATION

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

01/27/2019: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED- NO CHARGE

01/15/2019: SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED- NO CHARGE

COMPLAINT

01/10/2019: COMPLAINT

13 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Comment: NOTED ON THE COVER SLIP FOR EMERGENCY MOTION ---- ORDER ENTERED; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • NOTICE OF FILING; Comment: NOTICE: WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED - ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo; Date 2: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • AFFIDAVIT OF POSTED SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Thorsen, Justine; Date 2: 02/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION; Comment: OF ORDER GRANTING TENANTS RIGHT TO REMOVE POSSESSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • ORDER GRANTING; Comment: TENANT'S RIGHT TO REMOVE POSSESSIONS; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo; Defendant: Thorsen, Justine; Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc; Private Attorney: SINGER , PATRICK MICHAEL; Date Signed: 02/15/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • EMERGENCY MOTION; Comment: TO RE-ENTER; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo; Defendant: Thorsen, Justine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • JUDGE'S INSTRUCTIONS-INFORMATION ONLY; Comment: RE CORRESPONDENCE FROM DEFT - NOTED - REVIEWED - NO ACTION TAKEN - PER JUDGE VALKENBURG 2/11/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • ORDER LIFTING STAY WRIT OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo; Defendant: Thorsen, Justine; Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc; Private Attorney: SINGER , PATRICK MICHAEL; Date Signed: 02/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: 1/17/19 LORENZO LUMPKINS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED; Comment: 1/17/19 JUSTINE THORSEN; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: FOR COUNT I; Additional Info: Defendant: Thorsen, Justine

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Comment: FOR COUNT I; Additional Info: Defendant: Lumpkins, Lorenzo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2019
  • MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: OF POSSESSION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC; Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND MAILED- NO CHARGE; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Plaintiff: JNNR Investments Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: ((( SUMMONS FEES PAID ))); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GZ Apartments LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Judgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019058786; Judge: Valkenburg, Miriam V.

    Read MoreRead Less