Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/19/2021 at 11:22:27 (UTC).

Guzman, Francisco vs Toman, Joseph C.

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Guzman, Francisco filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Toman, Joseph C. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cook, J.. Martha, Cook, Martha. J., Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0040

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cook, J.. Martha

Cook, Martha. J.

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Guzman, Francisco

Zephyrhills, FL 33541

Defendants

Mills, Justin S.

Zephyrhills, FL 33541

Auto Magic of Mid-Florida, Inc.

1810 Ranchette Road C/O Charles Humphries As Registered Agent

Zephyrhills, FL 33543

Charles, Joseph C., IV

Dade City, FL 33525

Auto-Owners Insurance Company

200 E Gaines St C/O Chief Financial Officer

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Toman, Joseph C.

Dade City, FL 33525

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JAYSON , CHRISTOPHER PAUL

Attorney at JAYSON, FARTHING, & SKAFIDAS, PA

5401 W Kennedy Blvd Ste 600

Tampa, FL 33609

Defendant Attorneys

FISHER , ELIZABETH BENTON

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JENNIFER FORTE

2203 N Lois Ave Ste 707

Tampa, FL 33607

FORTE , JENNIFER K

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF JENNIFER FORTE

2203 N Lois Ave Ste 707

Tampa, FL 33607

IACONO , VINCENT FRANK

Attorney at LYDECKER DIAZ

Vincent F. Iacono 4350 W Cypress St Ste 910

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

04/01/2021: CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/29/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

01/28/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/04/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/04/2021: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/07/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/05/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/04/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/04/2021: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/04/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/04/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION; Additional Info: Defendant: Auto Magic of Mid-Florida, Inc.; Defendant: Mills, Justin S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: Mills, Justin S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION; Additional Info: Defendant: Auto-Owners Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR COPIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
36 More Docket Entries
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Guzman, Francisco

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Auto-Owners Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FORTE , JENNIFER K

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELIZABETH BENTON FISHER