This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 04/27/2023 at 16:34:02 (UTC).

GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH vs SECOND FLORIDA LIVING OPTIONS, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH filed an Other lawsuit against SECOND FLORIDA LIVING OPTIONS, LLC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Gabbard, X. Jennifer, Gabbard, Jennifer. X and Gabbard, Jennifer X. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0717

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Gabbard, X. Jennifer

Gabbard, Jennifer. X

Gabbard, Jennifer X

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH

Defendants

QUAY, ALEXANDRA

SECOND FLORIDA LIVING OPTIONS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FERRERA , ALBERT JACK

 

Court Documents

LETTER TO

01/26/2023: LETTER TO

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/26/2023: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/26/2023: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

COMPLAINT

01/26/2023: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/26/2023: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/26/2023: CIVIL COVER SHEET

Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

01/26/2023: Extended Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

01/31/2023: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

01/31/2023: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

MEMORANDUM OF LAW

02/21/2023: MEMORANDUM OF LAW

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

02/21/2023: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2024
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/94004094230 MEETING ID 940 0409 4230; Judicial Officer: Gabbard, Jennifer X

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMEMORANDUM OF LAW

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH; Private Attorney: FERRERA , ALBERT JACK;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: SECOND FLORIDA LIVING OPTIONS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GUNTA SMITH, AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF THE ESTATE OF ARNOLD SMITH;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketExtended Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLETTER TO; Comment: ATTY RE: SUMMONS - alpleadings@forthepeople.com ; mceriale@forthepeople.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less