This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 07/27/2022 at 17:55:41 (UTC).

GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.,Marshall, Daudi vs SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 05/26/2022 GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC ,Marshall, Daudi filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael and Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5351

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Marshall, Daudi

Defendant

SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Florida Cfo As Ra 200 East Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OLIVER , SHARONDA NICOLE

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES, P.A.

644 Cesery Blvd Ste 330

Jacksonville, FL 32211

Defendant Attorney

EASTERLING , TAISHA

Attorney at LAW OFFICES OF SANABRIA & MARSH

Employees Of Farmers Insurance Exchange 2290 Lucien Way Ste 280

Maitland, FL 32751

 

Court Documents

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/26/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/26/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/26/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

05/27/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/27/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

06/10/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

06/25/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

06/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/22/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/22/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/22/2022: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

07/22/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Comment: AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY NATIONAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Security National Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer EASTERLING , TAISHA