Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/10/2021 at 23:37:05 (UTC).

Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc,Garstka, Austyn vs Progressive Select Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/16/2021 Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc,Garstka, Austyn filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against Progressive Select Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6487

  • Filing Date:

    04/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Suite 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Garstka, Austyn

Defendant

Progressive Select Insurance Company

Po Box 6200

Tallahassee, FL 32314

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GUDIN , GREGORY EDWARD

Attorney at LANDAU & ASSOCIATES P.A.

1619 Nw 136Th Ave Ste 2C

Sunrise, FL 33323

Defendant Attorney

BRINGUIER , MICHAEL ERNESTO

600 N West Shore Blvd Ste 300

Tampa, FL 33609

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/24/2021: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

04/19/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/16/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/16/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/16/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLTFS COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Progressive Select Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gulfcoast Spine Institute Inc

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULFCOAST SPINE INSTITUTE, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE SELECT INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gudin, Gregory E, ESQ.