This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 09/17/2022 at 05:36:19 (UTC).

GULF BEST CARE LLC vs PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 07/27/2022 GULF BEST CARE LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Murphy, J. Logan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7348

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Murphy, J. Logan

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Figueroa, Sohira

GULF BEST CARE LLC

2700 W. Dr. Mlk Jr. Blvd. Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant

PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

200 E Gaines Street

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

Friedman Law Associates, P.L. 2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd

Tampa, FL 33607

Defendant Attorney

TANYHILL, MICHELLE RENEE

Attorney at PROGRESSIVE PIP HOUSE COUNSEL

901 North Lake Destiny Rd Ste 105

Maitland, FL 32751-4808

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

07/27/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/27/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

07/27/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

07/27/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/27/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/28/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/28/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/29/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

08/29/2022: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

08/30/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: PROGRESSIVE AMERICAN INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GULF BEST CARE LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GULF BEST CARE LLC, as assignee of Jennifer Martin is a litigant

Latest cases where Progressive American Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer TANYHILL MICHELLE RENEE