Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/08/2021 at 13:27:53 (UTC).

Guardianship of RIDER, DANNY RICHARD

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 Guardianship of RIDER, DANNY RICHARD was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1290

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litem

DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

Plainwell, MI 49080

Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litems

RIDER, DARLENE DIANA

Mayer, AZ 86333

DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

Plainwell, MI 49080

RIDER, DANNY RICHARD

Tampa, FL 33607

RIDER, RICHARD R

Tampa, FL 33626

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

HINES , ROBERT D., Esquire

1312 W Fletcher Ave Ste B

Tampa, FL 33612

BELZ , KYLE JONATHAN

Attorney at BELZ LAW, PLLC

955 E Del Webb Blvd Ste 101B

Sun City Center, FL 33573

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketORD APPR COMP OF ATTY AND EXAM CMTE; Comment: (INDIGENT)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketREP & REC GEN MSTR-MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketORDER ON REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE; Comment: 5/28, APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketORD APPTG GRDN-PERS-PROPERTY; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketLTRS GSHIP-ADULT-PERS-PROPERTY; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Date 2: 05/28/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketCOPY OF ORD DET TOT INCAPACITY; Additional Info: Incapacitated: RIDER, DANNY RICHARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketREP & REC GEN MSTR-MAGISTRATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketORDER ON REPORT OF GENERAL MAGISTRATE; Comment: 5/14, APPROVED, CONT TO 5/28/21, 9:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE; Comment: DATED 4/20/21; Additional Info: Next of Kin: RIDER, RICHARD R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketOATH, DESIGNATION & ACCEPTANCE; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketLETTER TO CLERK FROM; Comment: 04/15/21; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: HINES , ROBERT D., Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE; Comment: VICKI L REEVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketGUARDIANSHIP NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPT OF GUARDIAN; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Incapacitated: RIDER, DANNY RICHARD; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketAPP FOR APPT AS GUARDIAN; Comment: SHIRLEY ANN DEYOUNG; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Incapacitated: RIDER, DANNY RICHARD; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketJOINDER,WAIVER AND CONSENT; Comment: DARLENE DIANA RIDER; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Incapacitated: RIDER, DANNY RICHARD; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketFORMAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Incapacitated: RIDER, DANNY RICHARD; Next of Kin: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN; Petitioner: DEYOUNG, SHIRLEY ANN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HINES, ROBERT D.