Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 02/26/2021 at 00:38:49 (UTC).

Guardianship of MORALES, LAISY

Case Summary

On 10/28/2019 Guardianship of MORALES, LAISY was filed as a Probate - Guardianship lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Catlin, M.. Catherine, Corvo, T. Vivian and Corvo, Vivian. T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3277

  • Filing Date:

    10/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Guardianship

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Catlin, M.. Catherine

Corvo, T. Vivian

Corvo, Vivian. T

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litems

ISERN, AMELIA

Tampa, FL 33614

GARCIA, MARTHA

Tampa, FL 33612

MORALES, GRICEL

Tampa, FL 33624

Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litems

MORALES, LAISY

Tampa, FL 33614

ISERN, AMELIA

Tampa, FL 33614

GARCIA, MARTHA

Tampa, FL 33612

MORALES, GRICEL

Tampa, FL 33624

HERRERA, CARLOS

Tampa, FL 33614

MORALES, NELSON E

Tampa, FL 33614

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Classified By Court, Petitioner and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

GARCIA , ARIEL ORLANDO

Attorney at ARIEL O. GARCIA, P.A.

2708 N 22Nd St

Tampa, FL 33605-2760

HAIDERMOTA , LISA ANNE

Attorney at LISA ANNE HAIDERMOTA

412 Erie Ave

Tampa, FL 33606

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketREPORT OF CCC RE: INITIAL PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2020
  • DocketAUDIT-REPT OF CCC RE: ANN PLAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketINITIAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN; Comment: 07/27/19 - 07/27/20; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketANNUAL GUARDIANSHIP PLAN; Comment: 07/27/19 - 07/27/20; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketAMENDED GUARDIANSHIP LETTERS; Additional Info: Co-Guardian of Person/Property: GARCIA, MARTHA; Co-Guardian of Person/Property: MORALES, GRICEL; Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: GARCIA, MARTHA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: MORALES, GRICEL; Petitioner: GARCIA, MARTHA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: MORALES, GRICEL; Date 2: 08/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketPETITION; Comment: TO FILE SIMPLIFIED ANNUAL PLANS; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketORD WAIVING ANNL ACCOUNTING; Comment: AND INVENTORY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketORDER APPROVING; Comment: REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS OF GM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketORD APPTG GRDN ADV PERS-PROP; Comment: BOND WAIVED; Additional Info: Co-Guardian of Person/Property: GARCIA, MARTHA; Co-Guardian of Person/Property: MORALES, GRICEL; Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: GARCIA, MARTHA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: MORALES, GRICEL; Petitioner: GARCIA, MARTHA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: MORALES, GRICEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2020
  • DocketLTRS GSHIP-ADULT-PERS-PROPERTY; Additional Info: Co-Guardian of Person/Property: GARCIA, MARTHA; Co-Guardian of Person/Property: MORALES, GRICEL; Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: GARCIA, MARTHA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: MORALES, GRICEL; Petitioner: GARCIA, MARTHA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: MORALES, GRICEL; Date 2: 07/27/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketAPP FOR APPT AS GUARDIAN; Comment: AMELIA ISERN; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketAPP FOR APPT AS GUARDIAN; Comment: MARTHA GARCIA; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketAPP FOR APPT AS GUARDIAN; Comment: GRICEL MORALES; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: CARLOS HERRERA; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketCONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE; Comment: NELSON E MORALES; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPHYSICIANS CERTIFICATE - COPY; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketPET FOR APPT GDN ADV PERS-PROP; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketE-FILED CIVIL INDIGENT APPLICATION/FEE WAIVER; Additional Info: Guardian of the Person/Property: ISERN, AMELIA; Next of Kin: ISERN, AMELIA; Petitioner: ISERN, AMELIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GARCIA , ARIEL ORLANDO