Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/16/2020 at 22:02:56 (UTC).

Guardianship of IZQUIERDO, CARMEN OFELIA

Case Summary

On 03/17/2020 Guardianship of IZQUIERDO, CARMEN OFELIA was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0833

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litems

GONZALEZ, ASUNCION

Tampa, FL 33614

RAMIREZ GONZALEZ, ALEXYS

Tampa, FL 33614

IZQUIERDO, CARMEN O

IZQUIERDO, ALICIA

GONZALEZ, ALEXYS RAMIREZ

Tampa, FL 33614-4363

GONZALEZ, EDDY

GONZALEZ, PEDRO

GONZALEZ, GUILLERMO

GONZALEZ, CLARA

Miami, FL 33196

VAPOR, ANGEL MANUEL

Miami, FL 33177

GONZALEZ, HANAIS

IZQUIERDO, CARMEN OFELIA

Tampa, FL 33614

IZQUIERDO, ANAYBIS

GONZALEZ, ROSA

GONZALEZ, ASCUNCION

Tampa, FL 33614

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Classified By Court and Guardian Ad Litem Attorneys

MESSIANU, LIZ CONSUEGRA

Attorney at LUBELL ROSEN, LLC

1 Alhambra Plz Ste 1410

Coral Gables, FL 33134

MIRABAL , MIGUEL FERNANDO

Attorney at GLOBAL LEGAL

2655 S Le Jeune Rd

Coral Gables, FL 33134

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketGUARDIANSHIP NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPET FOR APPT LTD GDN PERS-PROP; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017; Additional Info: Next of Kin: GONZALEZ, ASUNCION; Next of Kin: RAMIREZ GONZALEZ, ALEXYS; Petitioner: GONZALEZ, ASUNCION; Petitioner: RAMIREZ GONZALEZ, ALEXYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY CASE SUMMARY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFO RULE 2-420; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAPP FOR APPT AS GUARDIAN; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017 ASUNCION GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketAPP FOR APPT AS GUARDIAN; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017- ALEXYS RAMIREZ GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN - CORPORATE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017-ALEXYS RAMIREZ GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketOATH OF GUARDIAN - CORPORATE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017 ASUNCION GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-7/31/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-8/03/17 FDLE RESULTS OF ASUNCION GONZALEZ

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-9/19/2018 OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketUNSIGNED ORDER FILED; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-9/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketMEMORANDUM; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-9/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-11/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUANCE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-1/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-1/28/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketPETITION FOR CHANGE OF VENUE; Comment: MIAMI-DADE COUNTY-1/28/2020 TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketCERTIFIED COPY OF; Comment: ORDER GRANTING PETITION FOR AUTHORITY TO TRANSFER GUARDIANSHIP TO HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2020
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK; Comment: HARVEY RUVIN MIAMI-DADE COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mirabal, Miguel F.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MESSIANU, LIZ CONSUEGRA