Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 05/30/2021 at 14:51:09 (UTC).

Guardianship of DETWEILER, TANNER DUPREE

Case Summary

On 04/14/2021 Guardianship of DETWEILER, TANNER DUPREE was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Corvo, Vivian. T and Corvo, T. Vivian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1320

  • Filing Date:

    04/14/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Corvo, Vivian. T

Corvo, T. Vivian

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Classified By Court

DETWEILER, EDWIN

Denver, CO 80238

DETWEILER, AMY

Denver, CO 80238

Minor

DETWEILER, TANNER DUPREE

Denver, CO 80238

Guardian Ad Litem

TONELLI, MICHAEL A, Esquire

Tampa, FL 33601

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Classified By Court Attorney

ALVAREZ , DEREK BRIAN

Attorney at GENDERS- ALVAREZ- DIECIDUE P.A.

2307 W Cleveland St

Tampa, FL 33609-3321

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketOATH; Comment: OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Additional Info: Guardian Ad Litem: TONELLI, MICHAEL A, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE; Comment: DATED 4/19/21; Additional Info: Petitioning Attorney: ALVAREZ , DEREK BRIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketREPORT OF GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Additional Info: Guardian Ad Litem: TONELLI, MICHAEL A, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketORD APPTG GRDN AD LITEM; Comment: (Tonelli)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketGUARDIANSHIP NEW CASE FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR APPROVAL; Additional Info: Next of Kin: DETWEILER, AMY; Next of Kin: DETWEILER, EDWIN; Petitioner: DETWEILER, AMY; Petitioner: DETWEILER, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • DocketPETITION FOR GUARDIAN AD LITEM; Additional Info: Next of Kin: DETWEILER, AMY; Next of Kin: DETWEILER, EDWIN; Petitioner: DETWEILER, AMY; Petitioner: DETWEILER, EDWIN

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ALVAREZ , DEREK B