This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 02/12/2022 at 16:39:32 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs WRIGHT, CHARLES E

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WRIGHT, CHARLES E. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Moody, S. James, Moody, James. S and Moody, James S, III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1994

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Moody, S. James

Moody, James. S

Moody, James S, III

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

GTE FINANCIAL

Defendant

WRIGHT, CHARLES E

Tampa, FL 33637

Garnishee

USIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH

Attorney at KASS SHULER, P.A.

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

CICCOSANTI , ASHLEY NICOLE

Attorney at ASPIRION

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 205

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/03/2020: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/01/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/01/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

04/01/2020: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

MOTION

02/25/2021: MOTION

FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

02/25/2021: FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

01/12/2021: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED

01/12/2021: WRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED

ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

12/29/2020: ANSWER OF GARNISHEE

NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

11/24/2020: NOTICE TO DEFENDANT

CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

10/23/2020: CLERK'S CERTIFICATE

WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

10/22/2020: WRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED

E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

10/14/2020: E-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CERTIFICATE OF

08/14/2020: CERTIFICATE OF

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/14/2020: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

07/02/2020: MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT

COURT TICKET

06/03/2020: COURT TICKET

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

06/03/2020: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION; Comment: FOR FINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL ORDER OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT; Comment: SIGNED BY JUDGE MOODY III; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E; Garnishee: USIC LLC; Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Plaintiff Doing Business As: GTE FINANCIAL; Private Attorney: CICCOSANTI , ASHLEY NICOLE; Private Attorney: MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH; Date Signed: 02/25/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF GARNISHMENT RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 11/30/20 USIC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Comment: ONESOURCE VIRTUAL (GARN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/23/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: WOCGI collectionsservice@kasslaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E; Garnishee: USIC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: 10/22/20 JSM III collectionsservice@kasslaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E; Garnishee: USIC LLC; Date Signed: 10/22/2020; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E; Garnishee: USIC LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: MAILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: AT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER; Comment: ZOOM NOTICE AND POSSIBLE WAIVER OF APPEARANCE AT SMALL CLAIMS PRETRIAL CONFERENCE BY FILING ANSWER FORM OR SETTLEMENT STIPULATION; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E; Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Plaintiff Doing Business As: GTE FINANCIAL; Private Attorney: MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH; Date 2: 05/26/2020; Judicial Officer: Moody, James S, III

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SERVED ON CHARLES E WRIGHT - 4/10/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: WRIGHT, CHARLES E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where USIC LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases where GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION DOING BUSINESS AS GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CICCOSANTI , ASHLEY NICOLE