Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/02/2020 at 12:25:27 (UTC).

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs MEDEL, ROGER R

Case Summary

On 02/02/2019 GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MEDEL, ROGER R. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8196

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

GTE FINANCIAL

Defendants

OJEDA MEDEL, MADY LYNN

Tampa, FL 33615

MEDEL, ROGER R

Tampa, FL 33615

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOUCH , JEFFREY J, Esquire

Attorney at KASS SHULER PA

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH

Attorney at KASS SHULER, P.A.

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

07/01/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

FINAL JUDGMENT

05/07/2019: FINAL JUDGMENT

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/01/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/29/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/02/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

02/02/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2019197001; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT; Comment: PLAINTIFF'S; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Comment: AFFIDAVIT IN PROOF OF CLAIM - NOT ATTACHED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROOF OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: MEDEL, ROGER R; Defendant: OJEDA MEDEL, MADY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: MEDEL, ROGER R; Defendant: OJEDA MEDEL, MADY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: MADY L OJEDA MEDEL 2/18/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 2/18/19 ROGER R MEDEL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: MEDEL, ROGER R; Defendant: OJEDA MEDEL, MADY LYNN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases where GTE FEDERAL CREDIT UNION DOING BUSINESS AS GTE FINANCIAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY J MOUCH, ESQ