This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/22/2020 at 10:39:06 (UTC).

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN S CARPENTER DECEASED

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN S CARPENTER DECEASED. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Lee, Moore. Laurel, Tesche Arkin, J. Caroline and Tesche Arkin, Caroline. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1329

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Lee, Moore. Laurel

Tesche Arkin, J. Caroline

Tesche Arkin, Caroline

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

1615 S Congress Ave

Delray Beach, FL 33445

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN HEIRS OF THE ESTATE OF JOHN S CARPENTER DECEASED

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOHN S CARPENTER

Riverview, FL 33578

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAY CARPENTER

CARPENTER, CLIFTON

CARPENTER, CLAY

TRAUTNET, CHERYL ELIZABETH

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLINTON CARPENTER

CARPENTER, CLINTON

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CINDI CARPENTER

CARPENTER, CHARLES

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES CARPENTER AKA CHUCK CARPENTER

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHERYL ELIZABETH TRAUTNER

CARPENTER, CINDI

COURTNEY WALTERS ESQ

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLIFTON CARPENTER

Guardian Ad Litem

KITE- POWELL, JULIA, Esquire

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULLMAN , ZACHARY Y

Attorney at ALDRIDGE PITE LLP

1615 S Congress Ave Ste 200

Delray Beach, FL 33445

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

09/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/18/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/09/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

08/01/2019: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY

03/21/2019: NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED RETURNED TO ATTORNEY

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/06/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/20/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

09/19/2019: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/09/2019: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM

04/11/2019: MOTION TO APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

04/08/2019: PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

COMPLAINT

02/06/2019: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF FILING

02/06/2019: NOTICE OF FILING

58 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CARPENTER, CHARLES; Defendant: CARPENTER, CINDI; Defendant: CARPENTER, CLAY; Defendant: CARPENTER, CLIFTON; Defendant: CARPENTER, CLINTON; Defendant: TRAUTNET, CHERYL ELIZABETH; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES CARPENTER AKA CHUCK CARPENTER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHERYL ELIZABETH TRAUTNER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAY CARPENTER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLIFTON CARPENTER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLINTON CARPENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NDUNP; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY; Judge: Tesche Arkin, Caroline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: CARPENTER, CHARLES; Defendant: CARPENTER, CINDI; Defendant: CARPENTER, CLAY; Defendant: CARPENTER, CLIFTON; Defendant: CARPENTER, CLINTON; Defendant: TRAUTNET, CHERYL ELIZABETH; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHARLES CARPENTER AKA CHUCK CARPENTER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHERYL ELIZABETH TRAUTNER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLAY CARPENTER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLIFTON CARPENTER; Defendant: UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CLINTON CARPENTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY(S); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING UNNAMED PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
79 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketLIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less