This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/13/2020 at 11:10:14 (UTC).

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs LEE, SAMMIE, Jr

Case Summary

On 01/15/2019 GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against LEE, SAMMIE, Jr. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Ober, Ann. Joelle. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3488

  • Filing Date:

    01/15/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Ober, Ann. Joelle

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

Defendants

LEE, ANDREANA

Tampa, FL 33603-4348

LEE, SAMMIE, Jr

Tampa, FL 33603-4348

Garnishee

PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOUCH , JEFFREY J, Esquire

Attorney at KASS SHULER PA

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH

Attorney at KASS SHULER, P.A.

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

HEATH , JENNIFER LAYNE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. SMITH

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2125

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/13/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

03/20/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

03/15/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

02/18/2019: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

01/23/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/15/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

01/15/2019: COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/15/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/15/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/15/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2019
  • DocketORDER OF CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Comment: ( FINAL ); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION; Date Signed: 11/08/2019; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT AGAINST GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA, INC. 08/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketWRIT OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT ISSUED; Comment: (AS TO SAMMIE LEE JR) 8/12/19 JAO collectionsservice@kasslaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: LEE, SAMMIE, Jr; Garnishee: PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC; Date Signed: 08/12/2019; Judicial Officer: Ober, Joelle Ann

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • DocketCLERK'S CERTIFICATE; Comment: WOCGI collectionsservice@kasslaw.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: LEE, SAMMIE, Jr; Garnishee: PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2019
  • DocketE-FILED MOTION FOR CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Comment: AS TO SAMMIE LEE JR; Additional Info: Defendant: LEE, SAMMIE, Jr; Garnishee: PEOPLEREADY FLORIDA INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFINAL DISPOSITION FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF; Comment: MAILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ANDREANA LEE 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: SAMMIE LEE JR 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: LEE, ANDREANA; Defendant: LEE, SAMMIE, Jr

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less