Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/17/2020 at 20:58:12 (UTC).

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION vs FLEETWOOD, PHILLIP A

Case Summary

On 02/02/2019 GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against FLEETWOOD, PHILLIP A. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Manning, M. Daryl. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8194

  • Filing Date:

    02/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Manning, M. Daryl

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

P.O. Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

Defendants

FLEETWOOD, MEAGHAN

Valrico, FL 33596-5728

FLEETWOOD, PHILLIP A

Valrico, FL 33596-5728

Garnishees

PROGRESSIVE EMPLOYER MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC

KELLY SERVICES USA LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

MOUCH , JEFFREY J, Esquire

Attorney at KASS SHULER PA

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

MOUCH , JEFFREY JOSEPH

Attorney at KASS SHULER, P.A.

Po Box 800

Tampa, FL 33601

HEATH , JENNIFER LAYNE

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT J. SMITH

101 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 2125

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

06/26/2019: FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

04/05/2019: DEFAULT ENTERED BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

04/03/2019: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/07/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/02/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/02/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

02/02/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

02/02/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/20/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: OGMTF; Judgment Description: ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR; Instrument Number: 2020073784; Judge: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2019
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION TO - FOR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2019
  • DocketMOTION FOR ORDER; Comment: (FINAL) / OF CONTINUING GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: KELLY SERVICES USA LLC 8/29/19

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: PROGRESSIVE EMPLOUYER MANAGEMENT CO., INC. 08/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019408783; Judge: Manning, Daryl M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF WRIT OF GARNISHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketNOTICE TO DEFENDANT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2019
  • DocketANSWER OF GARNISHEE; Additional Info: Garnishee: KELLY SERVICES USA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 2/18/19 PHILLIP A FLEETWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 2/18/19 MEAGHAN FLEETWOOD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: FLEETWOOD, MEAGHAN; Defendant: FLEETWOOD, PHILLIP A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PROGRESSIVE EMPLOYER MANAGEMENT COMPANY INC is a litigant

Latest cases where GROW FINANCIAL FEDERAL CREDIT UNION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Heath Jeniifer L

Latest cases represented by Lawyer JEFFREY J MOUCH, ESQ