Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/15/2021 at 15:46:36 (UTC).

Green, Juanita vs RANDSTAD US LLC

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 Green, Juanita filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against RANDSTAD US LLC. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, C.. Christopher, Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, Christopher C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4328

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, C.. Christopher

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, Christopher C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Green, Juanita

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant

RANDSTAD US LLC

C/O Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMPSON , JAMES MOTEN

Attorney at THOMPSON LEGAL CENTER, LLC

777 S Harbour Island Blvd Ste 245

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/26/2021: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/26/2021: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

05/26/2021: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

05/26/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/25/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

05/25/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

05/25/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

COMPLAINT

05/25/2021: COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2021
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 12:00 PM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/4812642204 MEETING ID: 481 264 2204 Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Additional Info: Defendant: RANDSTAD US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x1; Additional Info: Defendant: RANDSTAD US LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita; Private Attorney: THOMPSON , JAMES MOTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita; Private Attorney: THOMPSON , JAMES MOTEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Green, Juanita

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RANDSTAD CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMPSON , JAMES MOTEN