This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/16/2020 at 18:51:09 (UTC).

Gotham Collection Services Corp vs Fribley, Jacqueline

Case Summary

On 07/10/2020 Gotham Collection Services Corp filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against Fribley, Jacqueline. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Valkenburg, V.. Miriam. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0555

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gotham Collection Services Corp

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendants

Fribley, Jacqueline

Inverness, FL 34450-4131

Fribley, George

Inverness, FL 34450

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIDD , EVAN D

Attorney at CONSUEGRA LAW

9210 King Palm Dr

Tampa, FL 33619

 

Court Documents

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

07/13/2020: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: JACQUELINE FRIBLEY. 7/18/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED; Comment: GEORGE FRIBLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2; Additional Info: Defendant: Fribley, George; Defendant: Fribley, Jacqueline

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gotham Collection Services Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gotham Collection Services Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gotham Collection Services Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gotham Collection Services Corp

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2020
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gotham Collection Services Corp

    Read MoreRead Less