This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/12/2023 at 23:53:16 (UTC).

GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH vs GOODSON, MICHAEL WAYNE

Case Summary

On 05/02/2022 GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against GOODSON, MICHAEL WAYNE. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Nash, Christopher. C. and Nash, C.. Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3634

  • Filing Date:

    05/02/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Nash, Christopher. C.

Nash, C.. Christopher

 

Party Details

Counter Defendant and Plaintiff

GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

Tampa, FL 33609

Cross Plaintiffs, Defendants, 3Rd Party Plaintiffs and Counter Plaintiffs

GOODSON, MICHAEL WAYNE

Balm, FL 33503

GOODSON, RICKY DANIEL

Balm, FL 33503

GOODSON FAMILY LIMITED LIABILITY LIMITED PARTNERSHIP

C/O Michael W. Goodson, R.A. 14644 Joe Sumner Road

Balm, FL 33503

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

Tampa, FL 33601

SOUTHSTATE BANK, N.A.

C/O Office Of General Counsel, R.A. 1951 8Th Street Nw

Winter Haven, FL 33881

Cross Defendant and Defendant

HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY

Tampa, FL 33601

Intervenors

Barnes, James

Tampa, FL 33688

Barnes, Kim

Tampa, FL 33688

3Rd Party Defendants

BARNES, JAMES D

BARNES, KIM A

NESSMITH, SCOTT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

NOEL , AUSTIN MATTHEW

Attorney at FIRST AMERICAN LAW GROUP

7650 W Courtney Campbell Cswy Ste 1150

Tampa, FL 33607

NEUMAN , ROD BARRETT

Attorney at GIBBONS NEUMAN BELLO SEGALL ALLEN & HALLORAN

3321 Henderson Blvd

Tampa, FL 33609

Cross Plaintiff, Defendant, 3Rd Party Plaintiff and Counter Plaintiff Attorneys

DOGALI , ANTHONY ANDERSON BENTON

Attorney at DOGALI LAW GROUP

19321 Us Highway 19 N Ste 307

Clearwater, FL 33764

POPE , KENNETH CARDELL

Attorney at HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY ATTORNEY

601 E Kennedy Blvd Fl 27

Tampa, FL 33602

3Rd Party Defendant Attorneys

OQUINN , DAVID SHAWN

Attorney at FIDELITY NATIONAL TITLE GROUP

100 W Cypress Creek Rd Ste 889

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33309

LUCZAK , M BRADLEY

Attorney at WHITE & LUCZAK, P.A.

400 W Morse Blvd Ste 230

Winter Park, FL 32789

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

09/13/2022: CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

ANSWER

09/08/2022: ANSWER

STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

09/02/2022: STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

08/26/2022: REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE

STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

08/17/2022: STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/15/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

08/12/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

08/02/2022: ANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/25/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

07/20/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

07/15/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

07/15/2022: MOTION FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME

MOTION TO STRIKE

07/14/2022: MOTION TO STRIKE

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/28/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

06/28/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

49 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE; Additional Info: Private Attorney: NEUMAN , ROD BARRETT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NESSMITH, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Comment: ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL FOR THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT, SCOTT NESSMITH; Additional Info: Date Signed: 09/02/2022; Judicial Officer: Nash, Christopher C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NESSMITH, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NESSMITH, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NESSMITH, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO COUNTERCLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Third Party Defendant: NESSMITH, SCOTT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: 07/08/2022 DEFT JAMES D. BARNES; Additional Info: Third Party Plaintiff: GOODSON, MICHAEL WAYNE; Third Party Plaintiff: GOODSON, RICKY DANIEL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
43 More Docket Entries
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X5

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketStreamline Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketLIS PENDENS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEMERGENCY MOTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketVALUE OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE REAL PROPERTY CLAIM FORM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GORMAN, JACOB KENNETH

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SOUTHSTATE BANK, N.A. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer M BRADLEY LUCZAK

Latest cases represented by Lawyer O'quinn, David Shawn