This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 01/14/2023 at 16:21:38 (UTC).

Gordy, Alysyn vs Consumer Auto Credit Inc.

Case Summary

On 11/22/2022 Gordy, Alysyn filed an Other lawsuit against Consumer Auto Credit Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9776

  • Filing Date:

    11/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Gordy, Alysyn

Defendant

Consumer Auto Credit Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KOUSKOUTIS , MICHAEL

Defendant Attorney

SINGER , PATRICK MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2022: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

General Differentiated Case Management Order

11/22/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

11/22/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

11/22/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

COMPLAINT

11/22/2022: COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/22/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

ATTACHMENT

11/22/2022: ATTACHMENT

ATTACHMENT

11/22/2022: ATTACHMENT

ATTACHMENT

11/22/2022: ATTACHMENT

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

11/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

12/20/2022: MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

12/20/2022: NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION

Signature Page For Clerk's Default

12/20/2022: Signature Page For Clerk's Default

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

12/20/2022: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

12/27/2022: DEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/11/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 03:30 PM; Hearing Location: WEBEX: 1-904-900-2303 OR 1-415-655-0001 ACCESS CODE: 132 571 5688; Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT NOT ENTERED BY CLERK; Comment: DUE TO NOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION AND MOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED ON 12/20/2022; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSignature Page For Clerk's Default

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF LIMITED REPRESENTATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: CONSUMER AUTO CREDIT, INC - 11/28/22

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketATTACHMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Gordy, Alysyn;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Consumer Auto Credit Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less