Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 06/17/2021 at 22:12:02 (UTC).

GONZALEZ, LUIS T vs SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 03/08/2021 GONZALEZ, LUIS T filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Valkenburg, V.. Miriam and Valkenburg, Miriam. V.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2985

  • Filing Date:

    03/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Criminal Court Annex

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Valkenburg, V.. Miriam

Valkenburg, Miriam. V.

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

Riverview, FL 33579

GONZALEZ, LUIS T

Riverview, FL 33579

Defendant

SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

140 South Atlantic Avenue Suite 200

Ormond Beach, FL 32176

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROBINSON , CHRYSTAL P

Attorney at HL LAW GROUP

2601 E Oakland Park Blvd Ste 503

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33306

Defendant Attorney

DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

Attorney at KUBICKI DRAPER

400 N Ashley Dr Ste 1200

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT

03/08/2021: COMPLAINT

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/10/2021: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

03/08/2021: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

03/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Private Attorney: DENNIS , WILLIAM JOSEPH

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketAMENDED ANSWER; Comment: AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: SECURITY FIRST INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF FILING; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GONZALEZ, LUIS T; Plaintiff: TORRES-GONZALEZ, JOHANNA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Security First Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAM J DENNIS, ESQ