This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/13/2023 at 11:45:26 (UTC).

Godwin, Tiffany vs Red Roof Inns, Inc.

Case Summary

On 12/09/2022 Godwin, Tiffany filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Red Roof Inns, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Peacock, A. Emily, Peacock, Emily. A and Peacock, Emily A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0252

  • Filing Date:

    12/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Peacock, A. Emily

Peacock, Emily. A

Peacock, Emily A

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Godwin, Tiffany

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Red Roof Inns, Inc.

C/O Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent 1201 Hays St

Tallahassee, FL 32301

JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOCKWOOD , WESTLEY FRANK

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

201 N Franklin St Ste 700

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

RINE , JOHN AUSTIN

Attorney at LEWIS BRISBOIS BISGAARD & SMITH LLP

401 E Jackson St Ste 3400

Tampa, FL 33602

PUIG , KENNETH ALAN

Attorney at SHENDELL & POLLOCK, PL

2700 N Military Trl Ste 150

Boca Raton, FL 33431

 

Court Documents

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

02/22/2023: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

02/06/2023: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/06/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

02/03/2023: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

02/02/2023: NOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/02/2023: AMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/02/2023: AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE

STIPULATION

01/31/2023: STIPULATION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

12/29/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/09/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

COMPLAINT

12/09/2022: COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/09/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/09/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/09/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

12/09/2022: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2023
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 10:00 AM; Hearing Location: VIRTUAL COURT DATE - HTTPS://ZOOM.US/J/3058068636 MEETING ID: 305-806-8636 NO PASSWORD IS REQUIREDTELEPHONIC HEARING- 1-786-635-1003 SAME CODE AS ZOOM ID; Judicial Officer: Peacock, Emily A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Defendant: JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/03/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: JAX ONE INVESTMENTS, LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOT OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2023
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: NO COS / NO EXHIBITS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Godwin, Tiffany;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: X1; Additional Info: Defendant: Red Roof Inns, Inc.;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less