Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 07/05/2020 at 06:16:47 (UTC).

GLASSCO, INC. vs GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

Case Summary

On 01/28/2019 GLASSCO, INC filed an Other - Declaratory Judgment lawsuit against GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Allen, A. Lisa. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6838

  • Filing Date:

    01/28/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Declaratory Judgment

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Allen, A. Lisa

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

ABUD, ANDRES

WILDERMUTH, ROBERT

ALAN, KENNY

Robbinezz, Daniel

PEREZ, ANGEL

RAMON, REY

MARTINEZ, ANA

TAYLOR, VAL

CARDOSO, PEDRO

Pacheco, Juan

Alvarez, Kenia

ALI, SYAD

Cisnero-Rodriguez, Ricardo

WARD, NICK

RIVERA, JAZMIN

Fortis-Rivas, Janette

OLIVERIA, DANIEL

TOMPKINS, ERIC

GLASSCO, INC.

Flores-Sanchez,, Zaida

13 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Other Attorneys

TROWELL , LINDSEY RYAN

Attorney at SMITH, GAMBRELL & RUSSELL, LLP

50 N Laura St Ste 2600

Jacksonville, FL 32202

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO DISMISS

07/02/2019: MOTION TO DISMISS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

07/02/2019: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

05/07/2019: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/05/2019: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

COMPLAINT

01/28/2019: COMPLAINT

E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

01/28/2019: E-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/28/2019: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

01/28/2019: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

01/28/2019: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2019
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2019432690; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2019
  • DocketORDER; Comment: OF NOTIFICATION REGARDING COURT'S INTENT TO RULE ON PENDING MOTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY; Plaintiff: ABUD, ANDRES; Plaintiff: ALAN, KENNY; Plaintiff: ALI, SYAD; Plaintiff: Alvarez, Kenia; Plaintiff: CARDOSO, PEDRO; Plaintiff: Cisnero-Rodriguez, Ricardo; Plaintiff: Colon-Reyes, Martin; Plaintiff: Flores-Sanchez,, Zaida; Plaintiff: Fortis-Rivas, Janette; Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.; Plaintiff: Jimenez, Emilo; Plaintiff: LOPEZ, LETICIA; Plaintiff: MARTINEZ, ANA; Plaintiff: MYSHRARI, MICHAEL; Plaintiff: OLIVERIA, DANIEL; Plaintiff: PACHECO, JOSHUA; Plaintiff: Pacheco, Juan; Plaintiff: PEREZ, ANGEL; Plaintiff: RAMIREZ, LUIS; Plaintiff: RAMON, REY; Plaintiff: Rhyne, Maria; Plaintiff: Rivera, Cathy; Plaintiff: RIVERA, JAZMIN; Plaintiff: Rivera-Gonzalez, Carmen; Plaintiff: Robbinezz, Daniel; Plaintiff: Salvatore, Santamaria; Plaintiff: SURFACE, ELIZABETH; Plaintiff: TAYLOR, VAL; Plaintiff: TOMPKINS, ERIC; Plaintiff: Torres-Adorno, Carmen; Plaintiff: WARD, NICK; Plaintiff: WILDERMUTH, ROBERT; Private Attorney: CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P; Private Attorney: TROWELL , LINDSEY RYAN; Date 2: 09/24/2019; Judicial Officer: Allen, Lisa A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketAMENDED MOTION TO - FOR; Comment: BIFURCATE OR SEVER; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS AMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2019
  • DocketLETTER FROM CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2019
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO DISMISS; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketMOTION TO BIFURCATE; Comment: OR SEVER; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 07/02/2019
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS; Comment: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY 5/2/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: GEICO GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GLASSCO, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glassco, Inc., As Assignee Of, Carmen Cintron is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Trowell, Lindsey R