This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 09/12/2021 at 11:35:37 (UTC).

Glassco, Inc. vs Infinity Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 07/08/2021 Glassco, Inc filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Infinity Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C and Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5262

  • Filing Date:

    07/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Bagge-Hernandez, Michael. C

Bagge-Hernandez, C. Michael

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glassco, Inc., As Assignee Of, Gustavo Mejias

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Glassco, Inc.

808 West Deleon St.

Tampa, FL 33606

Mejias, Gustavo

Defendant

Infinity Insurance Company

C/O Cfo 200 East Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P

Attorney at THE LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER P. CALKIN P.A.

808 W De Leon St

Tampa, FL 33606

Defendant Attorney

MCDANIEL , BRANDEN VINCENT

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF GABRIEL O. FUNDORA

506 W Fletcher Ave Ste 101

Tampa, FL 33612

 

Court Documents

General Differentiated Case Management Order

07/09/2021: General Differentiated Case Management Order

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/08/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

07/08/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: Infinity Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glassco, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glassco, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glassco, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glassco, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glassco, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Glassco, Inc., As Assignee Of, Carmen Cintron is a litigant

Latest cases where INFINITY INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CALKIN , CHRISTOPHER P