Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 04/18/2021 at 16:38:40 (UTC).

Glass Max vs State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 04/09/2021 Glass Max filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Costello, Jessica. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3883

  • Filing Date:

    04/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Costello, Jessica

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Glass Max A/A/O Gerson Otoni

Tampa, FL 33607

Glass Max

Tampa, FL 33607

OTONI, GERSON

Defendant

State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

200 E.Gaines St.

Tallahassee, FL 32399

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PRIETO , ANTHONY THOMAS

Attorney at MORGAN & MORGAN

3705 N Himes Ave

Tampa, FL 33607

 

Court Documents

E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

04/14/2021: E-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/09/2021: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

04/09/2021: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/17/2021
  • HearingPRETRIAL; Hearing Time: 01:30 PM; Hearing Location: COURTROOM 303 800 E TWIGGS ST TAMPA, FL 33602; Judicial Officer: Costello, Jessica

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED PRE TRIAL SUMMONS ISSUED AND SET; Additional Info: Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Glass Max

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company is a litigant