Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 03/01/2019 at 10:45:36 (UTC).

Germano, Patsy Lynn vsOakfield Drive Emergency Physicians LLC

Case Summary

On 07/16/2016 Germano, Patsy Lynn vsOakfield Drive Emergency Physicians LLC was filed as an Other lawsuit. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Cook, J.. Martha and Wolfe, Mark. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6661

  • Filing Date:

    07/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Edgecomb Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Cook, J.. Martha

Wolfe, Mark

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Germano, Patsy Lynn

Brandon, FL 33511

Germano, Joseph Matthew

Brandon, FL 33511

Defendants

Galencare Inc

1200 South Pine Island Rd

Plantation, FL 33324

Oakfield Drive Emergency Physicians LLC

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Tampa Bay Imaging LLC

501 E. Kennedy Blvd Suite 810

Tampa, FL 33602

Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St Petersburg

St. Petersburg, FL 33707

Tampa Bay Radiology Associates PA

1200 South Pine Island Rd.

Plantation, FL 33324

Tampa Pain Relief Center Inc

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Total Vitality Medical Group LLC

24945 Us Hwy 19 North

Clearwater, FL 33763

Gulfcoast Spine Institute, Inc.

4211 Boy Scout Road Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

Logan Laboratories LLc

1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Florida Agency for Healthcare Administration Medicaid Third Party Liability Program

Tallahassee, FL 32308

Meadows Medical Solutions & Physical Therapy Inc

609 Medical Care Dr.

Brandon, FL 33511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WELLS , KIM EDWIN

Attorney at WELLS LAW GROUP

1211 Tech Blvd

Tampa, FL 33619

Defendant Attorneys

FRIEDMAN , PHILIP ALAN

Attorney at FL LEGAL GROUP

2700 W Dr Martin Luther King Jr Blvd Suite 400

Tampa, FL 33607

PAYNE , TODD STEWART

Attorney at ZEBERSKY PAYNE LLP

110 Se 6Th St Ste 2150

Fort Lauderdale, FL 33301

AUSTIN , MICHAEL GARRETT

Attorney at MCDERMOTT WILL & EMERY LLP

333 Se 2Nd Ave Ste 4500

Miami, FL 33131

GROSACK , MATTHEW DAVID

Attorney at HOLLAND & KNIGHT LLP

701 Brickell Ave Fl 33

Miami, FL 33131

SHUTTERA , ROBERT JOHN

628 Bypass Dr

Clearwater, FL 33764

BOLER , ALEXANDER R.

Attorney at BOLER LEGAL, PLLC

800 Ocala Rd Ste 300-125

Tallahassee, FL 32304

 

Court Documents

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/31/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/31/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/31/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/10/2016: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

AMENDED COMPLAINT

08/05/2016: AMENDED COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/16/2016: CIVIL COVER SHEET

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/16/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/16/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

FINAL JUDGMENT

02/01/2017: FINAL JUDGMENT

ORDER ON

11/28/2016: ORDER ON

ANSWER

09/19/2016: ANSWER

ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

09/01/2016: ANSWER TO AMENDED COMPLAINT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

08/31/2016: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

08/31/2016: MOTION FOR DEFAULT BY CLERK

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

08/08/2016: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/16/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/16/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

07/16/2016: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

30 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/17/2017
  • ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2017
  • ORDER ON; Comment: THE PARTIES' JOINT STIPULATION TO APPROVE DISTRIBUTION OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS APPROVED SENT TO ACCOUNTING 05/15/17 MJC; Additional Info: Defendant: Diagnostic Imaging Consultants of St Petersburg; Defendant: Florida Agency for Healthcare Administration Medicaid Third Party Liability Program; Defendant: Galencare Inc; Defendant: Gulfcoast Spine Institute, Inc.; Defendant: Logan Laboratories LLc; Defendant: Meadows Medical Solutions & Physical Therapy Inc; Defendant: Oakfield Drive Emergency Physicians LLC; Defendant: Tampa Bay Imaging LLC; Defendant: Tampa Bay Radiology Associates PA; Defendant: Tampa Pain Relief Center Inc; Defendant: Total Vitality Medical Group LLC; Plaintiff: Germano, Joseph Matthew; Plaintiff: Germano, Patsy Lynn; Private Attorney: AUSTIN , MICHAEL G, Esquire; Private Attorney: BOLER , ALEXANDER R.; Private Attorney: FRIEDMAN , PHILIP A, Esquire; Private Attorney: PAYNE, TODD STEWART; Private Attorney: SHUTTERA , ROBERT JOHN; Private Attorney: WELLS , KIM E, Esquire

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF CANCELLING HEARING; Comment: 5/2/17 @ 2PM - PLNTFS MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT & PLNTFS MOTION TO APPROVE MEDIATION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • JOINT STIPULATION; Comment: TO APPROVE DISTRIBUTION OF INTERPLEADER FUNDS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL; Comment: OF MOTION FOR FINAL DEFAULT JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: 5/2/17 @ 2 PM - PLTFFS' MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT FINAL JUDGEMENT - PLTFFS' MOTION TO APPROVE MEDIATION SETTLEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: SET FOR 05/02/17 AT 2PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Comment: FINAL; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Germano, Joseph Matthew; Plaintiff: Germano, Patsy Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION; Comment: TO APPROVE MEDIATION SETTLEMENT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Germano, Joseph Matthew; Plaintiff: Germano, Patsy Lynn

    Read MoreRead Less
52 More Docket Entries
  • 07/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT; Comment: FOR INTERPLEADER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2017
  • Judgment Code: ODISM; Judgment Description: ORDER OF DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017282946; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2017279637

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: DJ; Judgment Description: DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2017046610; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • Judgment Code: FJ; Judgment Description: FINAL JUDGMENT; Instrument Number: 2017046045; Judge: Cook, Martha J.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OAKFIELD DRIVE EMERGENCY PHYSICIANS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TAMPA BAY RADIOLOGY ASSOCIATES, P.A. is a litigant

Latest cases where Galencare, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases where Tampa Pain Relief Center, Inc. is a litigant