This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 03/19/2023 at 06:15:22 (UTC).

Genesis Auto Glass LLC vs Geico General Insurance Company

Case Summary

On 12/04/2022 Genesis Auto Glass LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against Geico General Insurance Company. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Criminal Court Annex located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are Allen, A. Lisa and Allen, Lisa. A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6832

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

Allen, A. Lisa

Allen, Lisa. A

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Genesis Auto Glass LLC

MCBRIDE, SHAWNDA

Defendant

Geico General Insurance Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VASILAROS , JACK WILLIAM

Defendant Attorney

SMITH , MARY JO MEGA

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

12/04/2022: REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

12/04/2022: REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

12/04/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

12/04/2022: DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

12/04/2022: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

12/04/2022: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/04/2022: CIVIL COVER SHEET

General Differentiated Case Management Order

12/12/2022: General Differentiated Case Management Order

E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

12/12/2022: E-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

01/26/2023: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

01/27/2023: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

02/14/2023: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

02/28/2023: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2023
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NOVD; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL; Instrument Number: 2023096212; Judge: Allen, Lisa A

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: IN WHICH TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT AND REQUESTS FOR DISCOVERY; Additional Info: Defendant: Geico General Insurance Company;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/27/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY; Comment: September 17, 2023, through September 25, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED 20 DAYS SUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Genesis Auto Glass LLC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less