This case was last updated from Florida Hillsborough Court System on 08/20/2019 at 11:34:34 (UTC).

GEMPEL, CLAUDIA vs GEMPEL, JILLIAN

Case Summary

On 01/17/2019 GEMPEL, CLAUDIA filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against GEMPEL, JILLIAN. This case was filed in Florida Hillsborough Court System, Plant City Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Tharpe, A. Chet. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0902

  • Filing Date:

    01/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Florida Hillsborough Court System

  • Courthouse:

    Plant City Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Tharpe, A. Chet

 

Party Details

Petitioner

GEMPEL, CLAUDIA

Plant City, FL 33566

Respondent

GEMPEL, JILLIAN

Portland, OR 92220

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/28/2019
  • FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • FINAL JUDGMENT NON CONTESTED DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA; Respondent: GEMPEL, JILLIAN; Signed: 03/27/2019; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, Chet A; Vol./Book: 26523, Page: 723, Number of Pages: 723

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • ORDER SETTING HEARING; Comment: FINAL WITHOUT PRETRIAL; Additional Info: Date 2: 03/04/2019; Judicial Officer: Tharpe, Chet A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • PETITION FILED; Comment: DISSOLUTION OF MARRIGE WITHOUT CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • SRS NEW CASE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • File Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: SHORT FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • ANSWER- WAIVER AND REQUEST FOR COPY OF FINAL JUDGMENT; Additional Info: Respondent: GEMPEL, JILLIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT; Comment: SHORT FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • NOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER; Additional Info: Respondent: GEMPEL, JILLIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • MARITAL SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA; Respondent: GEMPEL, JILLIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • 12 RULES OF COURTROOM BEHAVIOR; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA; Respondent: GEMPEL, JILLIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • WAIVER OF MANDATORY DISCLOSURE; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA; Respondent: GEMPEL, JILLIAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • DH513 FORM; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2019
  • COPY OF IDENTIFICATION; Comment: FL DR LIC 04/17/2017; Additional Info: Petitioner: GEMPEL, CLAUDIA

    Read MoreRead Less