This case was last updated from Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts on 07/19/2020 at 03:11:42 (UTC).

Garrett, Debrynna vs Facebook, Inc.

Case Summary

On 02/05/2020 Garrett, Debrynna filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Facebook, Inc. This case was filed in Hillsborough County 13th Judicial Circuit Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Stoddard, C.. Ralph. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1146

  • Filing Date:

    02/05/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Stoddard, C.. Ralph

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Jeury, Clifford

Tampa, FL 33602

Garrett, Debrynna

Tampa, FL 33602

Cansino, Angela

Tampa, FL 33602

Evans, Katrina

Tampa, FL 33602

Ritchie, Konica P

Tampa, FL 33602

Olden, Johnny

Tampa, FL 33602

Dixon, Timothy P, Jr

Tampa, FL 33602

Nelson, Courtney

Tampa, FL 33602

Paul, Tania

Tampa, FL 33602

Roberts, Alexander C.

Tampa, FL 33602

Walker, Daniel

Tampa, FL 33602

Richardson, Lamond

Tampa, FL 33602

Dotson, Lameka

Tampa, FL 33602

Murrell, Gabrielle

Tampa, FL 33602

Eubanks, Remeal

Tampa, FL 33602

Gould, Elton

Tampa, FL 33602

Collins, Nicholas

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendants

Cognizant Business Services Corporation

500 Frank W. Burr Blvd.

Teaneck, NJ 07666

Facebook, Inc.

1601 Willow Rd

Menlow Park, CA 94025

COGNIZANT TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS U.S. CORPORATION

2 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LECHNER , JAY PAUL

Attorney at JAY P. LECHNER, P.A., D/B/A LECHNER LAW

201 E. Kennedy Blvd. Suite 412

Tampa, FL 33602

Defendant Attorneys

DALY , JOHN PENDLETON

Attorney at RISSMAN, BARRETT, HURT, DONAHUE & MCLAIN

201 E Pine St Ste 1500

Orlando, FL 32801

HEARING , GREGORY ALAN

Attorney at GRAYROBINSON, P.A.

401 E Jackson St Ste 2700

Tampa, FL 33602

WAGGONER , DENNIS PARKER

Attorney at HILL WARD HENDERSON

Po Box 2231

Tampa, FL 33601

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

02/05/2020: REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed)

E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

02/10/2020: E-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

03/10/2020: MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/05/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

02/05/2020: REQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING)

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

02/12/2020: SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

03/02/2020: MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/05/2020: CIVIL COVER SHEET

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

03/06/2020: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • JudgementJudgment Code: NORFC; Judgment Description: NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Judge: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT; Additional Info: Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation; Defendant: Facebook, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: (DEFT'S) TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation; Defendant: Facebook, Inc.; Date 2: 03/09/2020; Judicial Officer: Stoddard, Ralph C.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2020
  • DocketMOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; Comment: TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL; Additional Info: Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation; Defendant: Facebook, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Comment: (FILED BY COGNIZANT TECHNOLOGY SOLUTIONS US CORP - (INCORRECTLY NAMED COGNIZANT BUSINESS SERVICES CORP)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAMENDED COMPLAINT; Comment: COS 03/06/2020 / NO EXHIBITS; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND E-MAIL ADDRESS; Additional Info: Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: COGNIZANT BUSINESS SERVICES CORPORATION C/O CT CORPORATION SYSTEM, 2/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/12/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED; Comment: FACEBOOK INC C/O CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY. 2/11/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 2 - jplechn@jaylechner.com ; admin@jaylechner.com ; shelley@jaylechner.com ; Additional Info: Defendant: Cognizant Business Services Corporation; Defendant: Facebook, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Comment: x 2 - jplechn@jaylechner.com ; admin@jaylechner.com ; shelley@jaylechner.com

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna; Plaintiff: Jeury, Clifford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna; Plaintiff: Jeury, Clifford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna; Plaintiff: Jeury, Clifford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna; Plaintiff: Jeury, Clifford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED (E-Filed); Additional Info: Plaintiff: Garrett, Debrynna; Plaintiff: Jeury, Clifford

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less