This case was last updated from Hillsborough County Courts on 06/27/2022 at 09:22:50 (UTC).

GARES, PHYLESIA vs EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC.

Case Summary

On 03/17/2022 GARES, PHYLESIA filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC. This case was filed in Hillsborough County Courts, Edgecomb Courthouse located in Hillsborough, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2253

  • Filing Date:

    03/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Hillsborough, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARES, PHYLESIA

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Defendant

EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC.

Corporation Service Company As Registered Agent 1201 Hays Street

Tallahassee, FL 32301

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

THOMAS , IAN M.

Attorney at MCPHERSON & THOMAS, P.A.

5723 Main St

New Port Richey, FL 34652

Defendant Attorney

KRAFT , MICHAEL

Attorney at CONROY SIMBERG

201 E Kennedy Blvd Ste 900

Tampa, FL 33602

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

06/08/2022: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

05/27/2022: NOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

NOTICE OF HEARING

05/19/2022: NOTICE OF HEARING

OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

05/17/2022: OBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

05/16/2022: RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

05/13/2022: NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/03/2022: REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

05/02/2022: ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

05/02/2022: NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

05/02/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

04/25/2022: NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/22/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

04/21/2022: ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION

JOINT STIPULATION

04/20/2022: JOINT STIPULATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

04/13/2022: REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

04/13/2022: NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

04/08/2022: NOTICE OF APPEARANCE

AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

03/29/2022: AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2022
  • HearingDifferentiated Case Management; Hearing Time: 02:00 PM; Hearing Location: WEBEX: 1-904-900-2303 OR 1-415-655-0001 ACCESS CODE: 132 571 5688 Judicial Officer: Gaylord Moe, Anne-Leigh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF NON-AVAILABILITY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF HEARING; Comment: JUNE 15 2021 @ 9:30AM- VIA WEBEX

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOBJECTION TO NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY NO SUBPOENA ATTACHED; Additional Info: Defendant: EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES; Additional Info: Defendant: EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE; Additional Info: Defendant: EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE RETURNED SERVED; Comment: ATLAS VAN LINES, INC. 3/28/2022 CORPORATE; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED SUMMONS ISSUED; Additional Info: Defendant: EFFORT ENTERPRISES OF SARASOTA, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketFile Home Location - Electronic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • DocketGeneral Differentiated Case Management Applies

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR DIVISION ASSIGNMENT (E-FILING); Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOMPLAINT; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketE-FILED REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED; Additional Info: Plaintiff: GARES, PHYLESIA

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KRAFT, MICHAEL